Braun, E Anne (CPSO#: 55324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton HealthCare
3001 Hosptal Gate. Oakville Ontari
L6M0L8
Ontario
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6162
Fax: (905) 815-5130
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E6X2
Canada
Phone: 9053584944
Fax: 9053584972
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 358-4944
Fax: (905) 358-4972
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Braun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Braun ( CPSO# 55324 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. E ANNE BRAUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987