Bray, Frederick Thomas (CPSO#: 65372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Suite 102
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: (613) 739-7753
Fax: 613-739-7808
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frederick T. Bray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bray ( CPSO# 65372 )

Business Address:
102 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 739-7753

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 21 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 21, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Thomas Bray,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bray has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. FREDERICK THOMAS BRAY
                                             ("Dr. Bray")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
                                                                         

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Resolution Committee
                  of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bray, certificate of registration number 65372, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my practice of gastroenterology and internal medicine,
                  including my use of Propofol, and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation into the information.

            (4)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.


            (6)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of
                  the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to restrict my practice as follows:
                  
                        (i)   I, Dr. Bray, shall not prescribe or administer Propofol to
                              any patient; and
                  
                        (ii)  For any patient  treated by me at any Out-of-Hospital
                              Premises ("OHP") with which  I, Dr. Bray, am affiliated,
                              Propofol shall only be prescribed and shall only be
                              administered by an anaesthesiologist who meets the required
                              qualifications of the Out-of-Hospital Premises Program
                              Standards, and who first obtains written permission from the
                              College after submitting a staff affiliation notification
                              form.
                  
            (9)   Propofol Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bray, shall keep a log of all occasions on which Propofol is
                        administered to any patient treated by me  at any OHP with which I,
                        Dr. Bray, am affiliated in the form set out at Appendix "A", which
                        will include at least the following information:
                  
                        (i)   the date of the patient encounter;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the name of the anaesthesiologist who prescribed Propofol to
                              the patient;
                        (iv)  the dose of Propofol prescribed;
                        (v)   the pharmacy that dispensed the Propofol;
                        (vi)  the name of the anaesthesiologist who administered the
                              Propofol to the patient.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake and agree to submit the original Propofol
                        log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the log
                        of patient encounters at all times, and to make it available to the
                        College upon request.
                  
            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of any Out-of-Hospital Premises ("OHP") with which I am
                        affiliated, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "B."  For further clarity, this sign shall
                        state as follows: "Dr. Bray must not prescribe or administer
                        Propofol to any patient.  In this clinic, Propofol must only be
                        prescribed and administered by an approved anesthesiologist.
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a) in the waiting room(s) of any Out-of-Hospital
                        Premises ("OHP") with which I am affiliated, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bray, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
                  
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (18)  I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bray, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (10) (a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation is being conducted into Dr. Bray'
                              practice.  As a result of the investigation, Dr. Bray has
                              restricted his practise as follows:
                  
                              i.    he will not prescribe or administer Propofol to any
                                    patient; and
                  
                              ii.   only an approved anaesthesiologist can prescribe or
                                    administer Propofol to Dr. Bray's patients.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Bray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Bray, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick Thomas Bray to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 21, 2017:

A College investigation is being conducted into Dr. Bray’ practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Bray has restricted his practise as follows:

he will not prescribe or administer Propofol to any patient; and

only an approved anaesthesiologist can prescribe or administer Propofol to Dr. Bray’s patients.