Bredeson, Christopher Norman (CPSO#: 58543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8158
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Bredeson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bredeson ( CPSO# 58543 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NORMAN BREDESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREDESON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011