Brickell, Sandra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 68888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056 Station C
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brickell ( CPSO# 68888 )
Dr. M. Koke ( CPSO# 68906 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ELIZABETH BRICKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRICKELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009