Brierley, James Duncan (CPSO#: 63361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2124
Fax: (416) 946-6566
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brierley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brierley ( CPSO# 63361 )

Business Address:
UHN-Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DUNCAN BRIERLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIERLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2005