Brimble, Kenneth Scott (CPSO#: 70331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33787
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Brimble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Brimble ( CPSO# 70331 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L7N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Site
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH SCOTT BRIMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIMBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2000