Brioux, Joseph Edward (CPSO#: 59765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Princess Street
Suite 203
Woodstock ON  N4S 4H4
Phone: (519) 421-7252
Fax: (519) 421-9924
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph E. Brioux and Dr. Karen E. Fryer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fryer ( CPSO# 59624 )
Dr. J. Brioux ( CPSO# 59765 )

Business Address:
203 - 600 Princess Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 421-7252

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A2
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Sakura House
715180 Oxford Road 4
RR # 5
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone Number: (519) 537-8515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDWARD BRIOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIOUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1989