Brodovsky, Sidney Allan (CPSO#: 66781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shafir & S. Brodovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shafir ( CPSO# 67091 )
Dr. M. Shafir ( CPSO# 60641 )
Dr. S. Brodovsky ( CPSO# 66781 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY ALLAN BRODOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995