Brokenshire, Jennifer Susan (CPSO#: 76196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 825-3571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L0B7
Canada
Phone: 905 319-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brokenshire ( CPSO# 76196 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER SUSAN BROKENSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROKENSHIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005