Brown, Deron Jeffrey (CPSO#: 75736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 401
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9393 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 673-9394
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERON JEFFREY BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2000 to 24 Nov 2000
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002