Brown, Jordan Stewart Isaac (CPSO#: 67148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201/214
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-8400
Fax: (905) 737-4579
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Jordan and Sheryl Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 67148 )
Dr. S. Brown ( CPSO# 67116 )

Business Address:
Suite 420
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 760-1415

Business Address:
Suite 202
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-8400

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN STEWART ISAAC BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2002 to 15 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993