Brown, Mitchell Howard (CPSO#: 59695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-6336
Fax: (416) 323-6325
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 225
162 Cumberland Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell H. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 59695 )

Business Address:
410 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-6336

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITCHELL HOWARD BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1989