Brown, Nadia Karen (CPSO#: 68892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: Barghout, Nadia Karen (used until: 02 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Student Health - Room 11
Lower Level
University Community Centre
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1151 Florence Street
Suite 300
London ON  N5W 2M7
Canada
Phone: 519-452-0046 Ext. 284
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA KAREN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000