Brown, Sheryl Estelle Zive (CPSO#: 67116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Zive, Sheryl Estelle (used until: 01 Aug 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 420
1600 Steeles ave. W
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone: (905) 760-1415
Fax: (905) 760-2735
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 Harding blvd w, suite 202
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-8400
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kahn ( CPSO# 32072 )
Dr. S. Brown ( CPSO# 67116 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 418-5068

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Corporation Name: Drs. Jordan and Sheryl Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 67148 )
Dr. S. Brown ( CPSO# 67116 )

Business Address:
Suite 420
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 760-1415

Business Address:
Suite 202
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-8400

Business Address:
48 Forest Lane Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 3N8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL ESTELLE ZIVE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993