Brown, William Mark (CPSO#: 62883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
246 Dundas St S
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8
Phone: (519) 267-7388
Fax: (844) 453-3558
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brown ( CPSO# 62883 )

Business Address:
Suite 3
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARK BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2000