Brownscombe, Annette Marlene (CPSO#: 63774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: Gullons, Annette Marlene (used until: 10 Sep 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinic 528
528 Dundas St East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone: (519) 645-1533
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 217
475 Talbot St
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Brownscombe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brownscombe ( CPSO# 63774 )

Business Address:
Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 645-1533

Business Address:
Clinic 217
475 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Phone Number: (519) 631-9040

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNETTE MARLENE BROWNSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1993