Bruder, Eric Alan (CPSO#: 81106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3530
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tilley & Bruder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tilley ( CPSO# 84523 )
Dr. E. Bruder ( CPSO# 81106 )

Business Address:
Northhumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC ALAN BRUDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009