Brule, Sylvie Madeleine (CPSO#: 68980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvie Brule Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brule ( CPSO# 68980 )

Business Address:
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIE MADELEINE BRULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997