Brunet, Donald George (CPSO#: 29849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2488
Fax: (613) 548-6131
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Brunet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brunet ( CPSO# 29849 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2308

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD GEORGE BRUNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1978