Bryson, Julie Christine (CPSO#: 86979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: (613) 968-5495
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. C. Bryson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bryson ( CPSO# 86979 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone Number: (613) 968-9840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE CHRISTINE BRYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Sep 2008 to 20 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009