Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Buczek, Malgorzata Jadwiga (CPSO#: 60734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 729-9463
Fax: (613) 729-5989
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Buczek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Buczek ( CPSO# 60734 )

Business Address:
103 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 729-9463

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 11 Jul 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA JADWIGA BUCZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCZEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1990