Buhrmann, Ralf Reynir (CPSO#: 61129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Eye Institute
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8706
Fax: (613) 739-6981
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralf Buhrmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Buhrmann ( CPSO# 61129 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Eye Institute
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8706

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALF REYNIR BUHRMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUHRMANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1994