Buitenhuis, Deanna Joy (CPSO#: 104138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8937
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8937
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807 684 6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEANNA JOY BUITENHUIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUITENHUIS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BUITENHUIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUITENHUIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BUITENHUIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUITENHUIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUITENHUIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018