Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bukala, Bernard Piotr (CPSO#: 70332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone: (519) 272-0064
Fax: (519) 272-0447
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Bukala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bukala ( CPSO# 70332 )

Business Address:
Wingham Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone Number: (519) 272-0064

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (518) 482-3440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD PIOTR BUKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001