Buldo, George Paul (CPSO#: 63871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 4446688
Fax: (905) 4446687
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
300 Gordon ST
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 4591
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buldo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Buldo ( CPSO# 63871 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PAUL BULDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992