Burga Alvarado, Alfonso Christian (CPSO#: 87456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Emergency Department
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Burga Alvarado Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burga Alvarado ( CPSO# 87456 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Emergency Department
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFONSO CHRISTIAN BURGA ALVARADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGA ALVARADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2007 to 08 Oct 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2008 to 16 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012