Burke, Brian Robert (CPSO#: 54354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 456
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 252-5250
Fax: (519) 252-3439
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian R. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burke ( CPSO# 54354 )

Business Address:
Suite 456
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 252-5250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ROBERT BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1985