Burke, Robert Clyve (CPSO#: 31491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
4th Floor, Room 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

242, 1333 Sheppard Ave. E.
North York, ON
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416 4987874
Fax: 416 8501138
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert C. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burke ( CPSO# 31491 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Robert   Clyve   Burke  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  adult
            otolaryngology, only.