Burns, Paulette Elizabeth (CPSO#: 50231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Armstrong Point Road
Port Carling ON  P0B 1J0
Phone: (705) 765-5349
Fax: (705) 765-5377
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4400
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paulette E. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Burns ( CPSO# 50231 )

Business Address:
2 - 5 Armstrong Point Road
Port Carling ON  P0B 1J0
Phone Number: (705) 765-5349

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULETTE ELIZABETH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987