Burry, Andrea Florence (CPSO#: 77909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Mapleton Road
Suite 140
Moncton NB  E1G 0N3
Phone: (506) 852-7087
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Craig Henry Drive
Suite #104
Ottawa ON  K2G 5W3
Canada
Phone: 613-695-8555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA FLORENCE BURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 02 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015