Burwash, Ian Gordon (CPSO#: 55663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7330
Fax: (613) 696-7246
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian G. Burwash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Burwash ( CPSO# 55663 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H3407B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5490

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GORDON BURWASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURWASH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987