Bush, Keith John (CPSO#: 64872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: 9056858400
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Bush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Bush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bush ( CPSO# 64872 )

Business Address:
206 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH JOHN BUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1992