Bussiere, Miguel Edgar (CPSO#: 76145)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miguel Bussiere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Division of Neurology C-2174 Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014