Butler, Deborah Joan (CPSO#: 58367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone: (519) 620-2223
Fax: (519) 620-7183
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah J. Butler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Butler ( CPSO# 58367 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Place Business Building
Suite 401
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone Number: (519) 620-2223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOAN BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988