Buys, Yvonne Margareth (CPSO#: 59322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Hospital
Western Division
E W 6-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5682
Fax: (416) 603-5682
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvonne M. Buys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Buys ( CPSO# 59322 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
EW6-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5682

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE MARGARETH BUYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUYS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989