Byrne, Doris Mary (CPSO#: 55949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare Services
Milton Site
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Halton Healthcare Services
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doris M. Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Byrne ( CPSO# 55949 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS MARY BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988