Katsios, Christina Maria (CPSO#: 92814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of General Internal
Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendon Trotter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trotter ( CPSO# 89039 )
Dr. C. Katsios ( CPSO# 92814 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Shereway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 256-6671

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIA KATSIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSIOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015