Cain, John Patrick (CPSO#: 21755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

797 Princess St., Suite 500
Kingston ON  K7L1G1
Canada
Phone: 6135441202
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John P. Cain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cain ( CPSO# 21755 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
102 Centre Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4E6
Phone Number: (613) 536-0457

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
767 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G3
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK CAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1972