Callen, David James Anthony (CPSO#: 77579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Room 3A52
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73392
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Callen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Callen ( CPSO# 77579 )

Business Address:
McMaster Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Room 3A52
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES ANTHONY CALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2007