Caloia, David Vincent (CPSO#: 71378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-3950
Fax: 613-256-4618
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caloia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2006

Dr. D. Caloia ( CPSO# 71378 )

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-3950

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID VINCENT CALOIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALOIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002