Cameron, Brian Howard (CPSO#: 62065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E7
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75231
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Howard Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cameron ( CPSO# 62065 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E7
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-1155

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN HOWARD CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1999