Cameron, Catherine (CPSO#: 63984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Start Clinic
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Phone: (416) 598-9344
Fax: (416) 598-8198
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milner Health Center
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Canada
Phone: (416) 287-3611
Fax: (416) 287-6460
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1993 to 28 Feb 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1992