Cameron, Donald Fraser (CPSO#: 100696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Phone: (905) 800-0429
Fax: (905) 800-0383
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200-99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Canada
Phone: 905-885-0611
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Fraser Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cameron ( CPSO# 100696)

Business Address:
Suite 203
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Phone Number: (905) 885-6712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD FRASER CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015