Cameron, Glenna Gillis (CPSO#: 30668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7575 16th Sideroad
Bolton ON  L7E 5R7
Phone: (647) 458-1235
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MIC
314 Broadway, Orangeville,
ON L9W 1L3
Orangeville ON  L9W 1L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 942-3101
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cameron ( CPSO# 30668 )

Business Address:
7575 16th Sideroad
Bolton ON  L7E 5R7
Phone Number: (647) 458-1235

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENNA GILLIS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006