Campanaro, Judith Margaret (CPSO#: 59560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 570-0090
Fax: (519) 570-3202
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judith M. Campanaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campanaro ( CPSO# 59560 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH MARGARET CAMPANARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPANARO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1993