Campbell, Joseph Alfred Leslie John (CPSO#: 71246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: (613) 966-4730
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Site
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell ( CPSO# 71246 )

Business Address:
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone Number: (613) 966-4377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALFRED LESLIE JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002