Cardella, Jonathan Andrew (CPSO#: 81000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yale University
Section of Vascular Surgery
330 Cedar Street
Boardman 204
New Haven CT  06520
United States
Phone: (203) 785-2561
Fax: (203) 785-7556
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Cardella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ANDREW CARDELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2011