Cardinal, Pierre (CPSO#: 50344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Room WO528
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8168
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Cardinal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cardinal ( CPSO# 50344 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
W0528 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8168

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE CARDINAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDINAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989