Carey, Timothy Patrick (CPSO#: 52935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
B1-184
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8021
Fax: (519) 685-8038
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thames Valley Children's Centre
779 Baseline Road
London ON  N6C 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8688
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy P. Carey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Carey ( CPSO# 52935 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite B1-184
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PATRICK CAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1988