Carleton, Susan Andrea (CPSO#: 25100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
127 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y4
Phone: (519) 743-1451
Fax: (519) 743-8220
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Head Waters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2702
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: (705) 457-1212
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Carleton, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carleton ( CPSO# 25100 )

Business Address:
127 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 743-1451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA CARLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLETON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974